U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-mj-00051-1
  • Case Name: USA v. NEHER
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • February 12, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
January, 2021
  • January 05, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • January 04, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
December, 2020
  • December 07, 2020: [SCHEDULING Order]
  • December 07, 2020: [Waiver of Detention]
  • December 03, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 01, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
  • December 01, 2020: [SCHEDULING Order]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for USA]
  • November 30, 2020: [PENALTY SHEET]
  • November 30, 2020: [Complaint & Affidavit]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.