U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-mc-00002
  • Case Name: ASEMANI v. ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 12, 2021: [Closed Dismissed]
  • November 08, 2021: [Motion (Other)]
July, 2021
  • July 13, 2021: [Copy Request]
  • July 12, 2021: [Order on Motion]
  • July 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 25, 2021: [Motion (Other)]
  • May 07, 2021: [Entry]
  • May 04, 2021: [Copy Request]
December, 2020
  • December 01, 2020: [MISC (Registration of Foreign Judgment From Another District)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.