U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-mj-01080-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MILES
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 29, 2021: [Notice of Intent to Request Redaction]
  • March 22, 2021: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • March 22, 2021: [Official Transcript]
January, 2021
  • January 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • January 06, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
December, 2020
  • December 21, 2020: [Probable Cause/Detention Hearing]
  • December 18, 2020: [CJA - Attorney Appointment Order]
  • December 16, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
  • December 09, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 09, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 08, 2020: [PENALTY SHEET]
  • December 08, 2020: [Complaint & Affidavit]
  • December 08, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.