U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-mj-01001-1
  • Case Name: USA v. KING
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 25, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • March 17, 2021: [Withdraw Document]
  • March 16, 2021: [Continue]
January, 2021
  • January 08, 2021: [Order]
  • January 08, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 07, 2021: [Vacate]
  • January 05, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • January 04, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
December, 2020
  • December 15, 2020: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.