U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-mj-01075-1
  • Case Name: USA v. FENELON
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • March 08, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
January, 2021
  • January 19, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • January 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • January 19, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 14, 2021: [Empty Text]
  • January 14, 2021: [Pretrial Detention]
  • January 11, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 08, 2021: [Continue]
  • January 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • January 06, 2021: [Hearing]
December, 2020
  • December 31, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • December 30, 2020: [Extension of Time (Other)]
  • December 22, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for USA]
  • December 21, 2020: [CJA - Attorney Appointment Order]
  • December 17, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.