U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-mj-01098-1
  • Case Name: USA v. JONES
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 08, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for USA]
December, 2020
  • December 29, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • December 28, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 23, 2020: [Empty Text]
  • December 22, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
  • December 22, 2020: [SCHEDULING Order]
  • December 21, 2020: [CJA - Attorney Appointment Order]
  • December 18, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 18, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 18, 2020: [~Util - Complaint Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.