U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-mj-01102-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MASHBURN
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 05, 2021: [Order of Detention]
December, 2020
  • December 29, 2020: [Probable Cause/Detention Hearing]
  • December 28, 2020: [Empty Text]
  • December 23, 2020: [CJA - Attorney Appointment Order]
  • December 23, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
  • December 22, 2020: [~Util - Complaint Unsealed]
  • December 22, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 22, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.