U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-mj-01088-1
  • Case Name: USA v. HANDLEY
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 25, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • March 23, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
January, 2021
  • January 20, 2021: [CJA - Attorney Appointment Order]
  • January 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • January 11, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
  • January 07, 2021: [Entry]
  • January 07, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 06, 2021: [Entry]
  • January 05, 2021: [Waiver of Detention]
December, 2020
  • December 31, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
  • December 29, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 29, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 28, 2020: [Empty Text]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.