U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-mj-00002-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Diaz-Flamenco
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 21, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 15, 2021: [Order]
  • January 14, 2021: [Order]
  • January 14, 2021: [Consent to Appear by VTC]
  • January 14, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • January 14, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 14, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • January 13, 2021: [Pretrial Bond Report]
  • January 12, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 12, 2021: [Order]
  • January 12, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 07, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.