U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-mj-01104-1
  • Case Name: USA v. STONEHOUSE
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 03, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
January, 2021
  • January 20, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • January 20, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 13, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 13, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 12, 2021: [Empty Text]
  • January 08, 2021: [~Util - Complaint Unsealed]
  • January 08, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 08, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 08, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.