U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mc-00001
  • Case Name: IN RE: ADMINISTRATIVE ORDERS
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 04, 2024: [MISC (Admin - Other Order/Procedure)]
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [MISC (Admin - Other Order/Procedure)]
  • January 09, 2023: [MISC (Admin - Other Order/Procedure)]
  • January 06, 2023: [MISC (Admin - Other Order/Procedure)]
  • January 03, 2023: [MISC (Admin - Other Order/Procedure)]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Order]
  • December 19, 2022: [MISC (Admin - Other Order/Procedure)]
  • December 01, 2022: [MISC (Admin - Other Order/Procedure)]
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [MISC (Admin - Other Order/Procedure)]
  • November 01, 2022: [MISC (Admin - Other Order/Procedure)]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [MISC (Admin - Court Operations Orders)]
  • October 25, 2022: [MISC (Admin - Other Order/Procedure)]
  • October 24, 2022: [MISC (Admin - Other Order/Procedure)]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [MISC (Admin - Other Order/Procedure)]
  • September 21, 2022: [MISC (Admin - Other Order/Procedure)]
  • September 19, 2022: [MISC (Admin - Other Order/Procedure)]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [MISC (Admin - Other Order/Procedure)]
  • August 19, 2022: [MISC (Admin - Court Operations Orders)]
  • August 10, 2022: [MISC (Admin - Other Order/Procedure)]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [MISC (Admin - Other Order/Procedure)]
  • June 21, 2022: [MISC (Admin - Other Order/Procedure)]
  • June 16, 2022: [MISC (Admin - Other Order/Procedure)]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [MISC (Admin - Court Operations Orders)]
  • May 24, 2022: [MISC (Admin - Court Operations Orders)]
  • May 16, 2022: [MISC (Admin - Court Operations Orders)]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [MISC (Admin - Court Operations Orders)]
March, 2022
  • March 11, 2022: [MISC (Admin - Other Order/Procedure)]
  • March 02, 2022: [MISC (Admin - Other Order/Procedure)]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [MISC (Admin - Other Order/Procedure)]
  • February 09, 2022: [MISC (Admin - Other Order/Procedure)]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [MISC (Admin - Other Order/Procedure)]
  • January 14, 2022: [MISC (Admin - Court Operations Orders)]
December, 2021
  • December 03, 2021: [MISC (Admin - Other Order/Procedure)]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [MISC (Admin - Other Order/Procedure)]
  • November 19, 2021: [MISC (Admin - Other Order/Procedure)]
  • November 04, 2021: [MISC (Admin - Other Order/Procedure)]
  • November 02, 2021: [MISC (Admin - Other Order/Procedure)]
October, 2021
  • October 19, 2021: [MISC (Admin - Court Operations Orders)]
September, 2021
  • September 21, 2021: [MISC (Admin - Internal Court Policies)]
  • September 17, 2021: [MISC (Admin - Other Order/Procedure)]
  • September 16, 2021: [MISC (Admin - Other Order/Procedure)]
  • September 09, 2021: [MISC (Admin - Other Order/Procedure)]
  • September 07, 2021: [MISC (Admin - Court Operations Orders)]
  • September 02, 2021: [MISC (Admin - Other Order/Procedure)]
August, 2021
  • August 02, 2021: [MISC (Admin - Court Operations Orders)]
July, 2021
  • July 15, 2021: [MISC (Admin - Other Order/Procedure)]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [MISC (Admin - Other Order/Procedure)]
  • June 23, 2021: [MISC (Admin - Court Operations Orders)]
  • June 23, 2021: [MISC (Admin - Other Order/Procedure)]
  • June 15, 2021: [MISC (Admin - Other Order/Procedure)]
  • June 10, 2021: [MISC (Admin - Court Operations Orders)]
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [MISC (Admin - Court Operations Orders)]
  • May 20, 2021: [MISC (Admin - Other Order/Procedure)]
  • May 13, 2021: [MISC (Admin - Other Order/Procedure)]
  • May 10, 2021: [MISC (Admin - Other Order/Procedure)]
April, 2021
  • April 22, 2021: [MISC (Admin - Court Operations Orders)]
  • April 20, 2021: [MISC (Admin - Other Order/Procedure)]
  • April 05, 2021: [MISC (Admin - Other Order/Procedure)]
  • April 02, 2021: [MISC (Admin - Court Operations Orders)]
  • April 01, 2021: [MISC (Admin - Other Order/Procedure)]
March, 2021
  • March 26, 2021: [MISC (Admin - Other Order/Procedure)]
  • March 16, 2021: [MISC (Admin - Court Operations Orders)]
February, 2021
  • February 01, 2021: [MISC (Admin - Internal Court Policies)]
January, 2021
  • January 27, 2021: [MISC (Admin - Other Order/Procedure)]
  • January 14, 2021: [MISC (Admin - Court Operations Orders)]
  • January 11, 2021: [MISC (Admin - Court Operations Orders)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.