U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-mj-01077-1
  • Case Name: USA v. EDMOND
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • February 05, 2021: [Order on Request/Consent to MODIFY Conditions of Pretrial Release (Applicable party - doc)]
January, 2021
  • January 21, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
  • January 19, 2021: [CJA - Attorney Appointment Order]
  • January 15, 2021: [Probable Cause/Detention Hearing]
  • January 14, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 13, 2021: [Empty Text]
  • January 11, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
  • January 11, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 11, 2021: [~Util - Complaint Unsealed]
  • January 11, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.