U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-mj-00003-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Jenkins
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 20, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • January 20, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 19, 2021: [Consent to Appear by VTC]
  • January 15, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 15, 2021: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • January 15, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 14, 2021: [Pretrial Bond Report]
  • January 13, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 13, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • January 13, 2021: [Notice of Hearing/Deadlines]
  • January 13, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • January 11, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.