U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00002-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Vermilion
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 22, 2021: [Consent to Appear by VTC]
  • January 21, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 20, 2021: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • January 20, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • January 19, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 15, 2021: [Consent to Appear by VTC]
  • January 15, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 14, 2021: [Addendum to Pretrial Bond Report]
  • January 14, 2021: [Pretrial Bond Report]
  • January 13, 2021: [Consent to Appear by VTC]
  • January 13, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 13, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 13, 2021: [Order]
  • January 13, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 13, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 12, 2021: [Detain]
  • January 12, 2021: [Continue]
  • January 12, 2021: [Notice of Hearing/Deadlines]
  • January 12, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • January 12, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • January 12, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • January 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Case]
  • January 12, 2021: [Seal Case]
  • January 12, 2021: [Complaint - Sealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.