U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-mj-00007-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Zaidan
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 20, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • April 16, 2021: [Extension of Time to Indict]
March, 2021
  • March 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Travel]
  • March 09, 2021: [Travel ]
February, 2021
  • February 17, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • February 17, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • January 27, 2021: [Extension of Time to Indict]
  • January 21, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 15, 2021: [Order]
  • January 15, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 14, 2021: [Pretrial Bond Report]
  • January 14, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 14, 2021: [Bond]
  • January 13, 2021: [Consent to Appear by VTC]
  • January 13, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 13, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • January 13, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 13, 2021: [Order]
  • January 13, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 13, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • January 13, 2021: [Complaint - Sealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.