U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mc-00003
  • Case Name: MCCULLAGH et al v. ATTORNEY GENERAL OF INDIANA et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 11, 2021: [Order]
  • May 11, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 10, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
April, 2021
  • April 27, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • April 19, 2021: [Submission]
March, 2021
  • March 29, 2021: [SCHEDULING Order]
January, 2021
  • January 14, 2021: [Motion (Other)]
  • January 14, 2021: [Application]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.