U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00003-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Klaff
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 22, 2021: [Consent to Appear by VTC]
  • January 21, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • January 20, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 20, 2021: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • January 20, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 19, 2021: [Pretrial Bond Report]
  • January 15, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 15, 2021: [Order]
  • January 15, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 15, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • January 15, 2021: [Detain]
  • January 15, 2021: [Notice of Hearing/Deadlines]
  • January 15, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • January 15, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • January 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Case]
  • January 14, 2021: [Seal Case]
  • January 14, 2021: [Complaint - Sealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.