U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-mj-00006-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CARUTHERS
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • June 29, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
  • June 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
April, 2021
  • April 05, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for USA]
March, 2021
  • March 18, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • March 17, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • January 28, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
  • January 27, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 27, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 22, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
  • January 20, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 20, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 15, 2021: [Entry]
  • January 15, 2021: [SCHEDULING Order]
  • January 15, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for USA]
  • January 15, 2021: [PENALTY SHEET]
  • January 15, 2021: [Complaint & Affidavit]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.