U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00013-1
  • Case Name: USA v. JONES, et al.
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Attorney Appearance]
  • March 22, 2022: [Withdraw Attorney Appearance]
  • March 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 18, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • March 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • March 03, 2022: [Extension of Time (Other)]
March, 2021
  • March 26, 2021: [Bond Hearing/Pretrial Release]
  • March 04, 2021: [Bond Hearing/Pretrial Release]
  • March 04, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [SCHEDULING Order]
  • February 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • February 18, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
  • February 09, 2021: [CJA - Attorney Appointment Order]
January, 2021
  • January 26, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 26, 2021: [Probable Cause/Detention Hearing]
  • January 25, 2021: [Notice of IFCD Attorney Designation]
  • January 25, 2021: [Waiver of Detention]
  • January 24, 2021: [Empty Text]
  • January 22, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
  • January 21, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
  • January 20, 2021: [CJA - Attorney Appointment Order]
  • January 20, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 20, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 20, 2021: [~Util - Complaint Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.