U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00050-1
  • Case Name: USA v. GREENLEE
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • October 14, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
August, 2021
  • August 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • August 05, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
June, 2021
  • June 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • June 16, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
April, 2021
  • April 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 06, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
February, 2021
  • February 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • February 08, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
  • February 05, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 26, 2021: [Empty Text]
  • January 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • January 20, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • January 20, 2021: [PENALTY SHEET]
  • January 20, 2021: [Complaint & Affidavit]
  • January 20, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.