U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-mj-00010-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Kelly
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 16, 2021: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • February 13, 2021: [Commitment to Another District]
January, 2021
  • January 27, 2021: [Pretrial Bond Report]
  • January 22, 2021: [Waiver of Rule 5 Hearings]
  • January 22, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Rule 5c3 - formerly Rule 40]
  • January 22, 2021: [Consent to Appear by VTC]
  • January 22, 2021: [Arrest - Rule 5]
  • January 20, 2021: [Order]
  • January 20, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 20, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • January 20, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 20, 2021: [Rule 5c3 Documents Received]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.