U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00051-1
  • Case Name: USA v. JOHNSON et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 12, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • February 11, 2021: [Continue]
  • February 10, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 10, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
  • February 08, 2021: [CJA - Attorney Appointment Order]
  • February 05, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 05, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 03, 2021: [Empty Text]
January, 2021
  • January 21, 2021: [PENALTY SHEET]
  • January 21, 2021: [Complaint & Affidavit]
  • January 21, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.