U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00065-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CEARING
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • March 04, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
  • March 03, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
February, 2021
  • February 12, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 10, 2021: [Empty Text]
  • February 05, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 05, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2021
  • January 26, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • January 26, 2021: [Complaint & Affidavit]
  • January 26, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.