U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-mj-00004-1
  • Case Name: USA v. WAIZ
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 01, 2021: [0 - Docket Text Only]
  • March 01, 2021: [Preliminary Hearing]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • February 26, 2021: [0 - Docket Text Only]
  • February 26, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 26, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 22, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
  • February 19, 2021: [0 - Docket Text Only]
  • February 19, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 19, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 17, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
  • February 17, 2021: [SCHEDULING Order]
  • February 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • February 11, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
January, 2021
  • January 26, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for USA]
  • January 26, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • January 26, 2021: [Complaint & Affidavit]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.