U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00069-1
  • Case Name: USA v. WASHBURN
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • May 10, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
April, 2021
  • April 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 08, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
February, 2021
  • February 24, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • February 23, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
  • February 05, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • February 05, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 02, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
  • February 01, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
January, 2021
  • January 27, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • January 27, 2021: [Complaint & Affidavit]
  • January 27, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.