U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-mj-00011-1
  • Case Name: USA v. WASNIDGE
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 06, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Motion (Other)]
March, 2021
  • March 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • March 15, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
  • March 03, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 03, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 03, 2021: [Order]
  • March 02, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
  • March 01, 2021: [SCHEDULING Order]
January, 2021
  • January 27, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for USA]
  • January 27, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • January 27, 2021: [Complaint & Affidavit]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.