U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mc-00006
  • Case Name: ELECTROLUX NORTH AMERICA, INC. v. PERFORMANCE METALS, INC.
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • February 02, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear pro hac vice]
  • February 01, 2021: [Order on Motion]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Appear pro hac vice]
  • January 29, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 28, 2021: [MISC (Notice of Judge Assignment)]
  • January 28, 2021: [Motion (Other)]
  • January 28, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 27, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support]
  • January 27, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 27, 2021: [Quash]
  • January 27, 2021: [Miscellaneous Case - Initiating Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.