U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00083-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MAJORS et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • April 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Attorney Appearance]
  • April 14, 2021: [Withdraw Attorney Appearance]
  • April 14, 2021: [Withdraw Document]
  • April 13, 2021: [Withdraw Attorney Appearance]
February, 2021
  • February 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • February 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • February 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • February 18, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
  • February 18, 2021: [Withdraw Document]
  • February 17, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
  • February 05, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 05, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Attorney Appearance]
  • February 02, 2021: [Empty Text]
  • February 02, 2021: [Withdraw Attorney Appearance]
  • February 02, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
  • February 01, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
  • February 01, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 01, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2021
  • January 28, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • January 28, 2021: [Complaint & Affidavit]
  • January 28, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.