U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-mj-00006-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Odom
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 16, 2021: [Continue]
February, 2021
  • February 16, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 09, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 09, 2021: [Bond]
  • February 05, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 05, 2021: [Order Finding Probable Cause]
  • February 05, 2021: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • February 05, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 02, 2021: [Order]
  • February 02, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 02, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 01, 2021: [Consent to Appear by VTC]
  • February 01, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 01, 2021: [Pretrial Bond Report]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • January 29, 2021: [Notice of Hearing/Deadlines]
  • January 29, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • January 29, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.