U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00093-1
  • Case Name: USA v. JACKSON
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 12, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 12, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 10, 2021: [Empty Text]
  • February 05, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 05, 2021: [Submission]
  • February 05, 2021: [Continue]
  • February 03, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
  • February 02, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 02, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 01, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • February 01, 2021: [Complaint & Affidavit]
  • February 01, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.