U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00090-1
  • Case Name: USA v. ARNOLD
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • February 22, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
  • February 09, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 08, 2021: [Submission]
  • February 08, 2021: [Empty Text]
  • February 03, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
  • February 02, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 02, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 01, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • February 01, 2021: [Complaint & Affidavit]
  • February 01, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.