U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00095-1
  • Case Name: USA v. COX
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 18, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Attorney Appearance]
  • May 18, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • May 17, 2021: [Withdraw Document]
  • May 14, 2021: [Withdraw Attorney Appearance]
March, 2021
  • March 15, 2021: [CJA - Attorney Appointment Order]
  • March 10, 2021: [Notice of IFCD Attorney Designation]
  • March 10, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
  • March 09, 2021: [SCHEDULING Order]
  • March 09, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 09, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 08, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
  • March 03, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for USA]
February, 2021
  • February 02, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • February 02, 2021: [Complaint & Affidavit]
  • February 02, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.