U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00005-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Barnett
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 22, 2021: [Order]
  • February 22, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 22, 2021: [Dismiss ]
  • February 17, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • February 17, 2021: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • February 11, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 11, 2021: [Order]
  • February 11, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • February 11, 2021: [Continue]
  • February 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 10, 2021: [Continue]
  • February 10, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 09, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 09, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 09, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 08, 2021: [Pretrial Bond Report]
  • February 05, 2021: [Consent to Appear by VTC]
  • February 05, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 05, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • February 05, 2021: [Notice of Hearing/Deadlines]
  • February 05, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • February 05, 2021: [Detain]
  • February 05, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.