U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00008-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Wilkes
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 12, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • February 12, 2021: [Consent to Appear by VTC]
  • February 12, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 12, 2021: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • February 10, 2021: [Pretrial Bond Report]
  • February 09, 2021: [Order]
  • February 09, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • February 09, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 09, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 09, 2021: [Continue]
  • February 09, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 09, 2021: [Consent to Appear by VTC]
  • February 09, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • February 08, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 08, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 08, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • February 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas corpus Ad Prosequendum]
  • February 08, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • February 08, 2021: [Notice of Hearing/Deadlines]
  • February 05, 2021: [Detain]
  • February 05, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • February 05, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.