U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00102-1
  • Case Name: USA v. OSTRUM
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 22, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • February 22, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • February 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Attorney Appearance]
  • February 22, 2021: [Submission]
  • February 19, 2021: [Withdraw Attorney Appearance]
  • February 19, 2021: [Withdraw Document]
  • February 19, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
  • February 19, 2021: [Submission]
  • February 18, 2021: [Withdraw Attorney Appearance]
  • February 18, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
  • February 16, 2021: [SCHEDULING Order]
  • February 10, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 10, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 09, 2021: [Empty Text]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.