U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00125-1
  • Case Name: USA v. LEE
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 13, 2021: [Entry]
  • April 13, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 09, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 09, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 02, 2021: [Empty Text]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 30, 2021: [Continue]
  • March 30, 2021: [SCHEDULING Order]
  • March 25, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Attorney Appearance]
  • March 24, 2021: [Withdraw Attorney Appearance]
  • March 24, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
February, 2021
  • February 12, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
  • February 11, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • February 11, 2021: [Complaint & Affidavit]
  • February 11, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.