U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00141-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BEJARANO
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 04, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 04, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
February, 2021
  • February 24, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 24, 2021: [Probable Cause/Detention Hearing]
  • February 24, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 19, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 19, 2021: [~Util - Complaint Unsealed]
  • February 19, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 17, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
  • February 16, 2021: [Empty Text]
  • February 12, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • February 12, 2021: [Complaint & Affidavit]
  • February 12, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.