U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00138-1
  • Case Name: USA v. GATICA
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • February 07, 2022: [Extension of Time (Other)]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • December 28, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
November, 2021
  • November 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • November 01, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
  • September 30, 2021: [Withdraw Document]
  • September 29, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • August 30, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
July, 2021
  • July 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • July 13, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
May, 2021
  • May 04, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • May 04, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
March, 2021
  • March 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • March 08, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
February, 2021
  • February 24, 2021: [Entry]
  • February 24, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
  • February 23, 2021: [Empty Text]
  • February 22, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
  • February 19, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 19, 2021: [~Util - Complaint Unsealed]
  • February 19, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 12, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • February 12, 2021: [Complaint & Affidavit]
  • February 12, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.