U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-mc-00007
  • Case Name: Asemani v. The Islamic Republic of Iran Interests Section of Iran
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Reopen Case]
  • March 18, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • March 07, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Report and Recommendations]
  • February 02, 2022: [Order Referring Motion]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
August, 2021
  • August 03, 2021: [Letter]
July, 2021
  • July 14, 2021: [Letter]
June, 2021
  • June 25, 2021: [Reopen Case]
May, 2021
  • May 04, 2021: [Letter]
April, 2021
  • April 12, 2021: [Order]
  • April 09, 2021: [Letter]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Order]
  • March 19, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • March 12, 2021: [Letter]
  • March 05, 2021: [Letter]
February, 2021
  • February 19, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.