U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00123-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BERRY
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • October 22, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • August 19, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
June, 2021
  • June 25, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • June 23, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
April, 2021
  • April 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 19, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 25, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Attorney Appearance]
  • February 24, 2021: [Empty Text]
  • February 24, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • February 24, 2021: [Withdraw Attorney Appearance]
  • February 24, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
  • February 23, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
  • February 22, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.