U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00167-1
  • Case Name: USA v. EASTER
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • March 19, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
  • March 10, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • March 10, 2021: [Probable Cause/Detention Hearing]
  • March 02, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
  • March 01, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 01, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: [Empty Text]
  • February 23, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • February 23, 2021: [Complaint & Affidavit]
  • February 23, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.