U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00144-1
  • Case Name: USA v. RICE
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • October 14, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
September, 2021
  • September 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • September 13, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
August, 2021
  • August 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • August 11, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
June, 2021
  • June 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • June 07, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
April, 2021
  • April 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 16, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
March, 2021
  • March 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • March 08, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
  • March 02, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 26, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 25, 2021: [Empty Text]
  • February 24, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 24, 2021: [~Util - Complaint Unsealed]
  • February 24, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.