U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00133-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BROWN
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Attorney Appearance]
  • May 14, 2021: [Withdraw Attorney Appearance]
  • May 13, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
March, 2021
  • March 09, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • March 09, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • March 02, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
  • March 01, 2021: [Unseal Case]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 26, 2021: [~Util - Complaint Unsealed]
  • February 26, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.