U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00187-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MITCHELL
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • June 22, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
May, 2021
  • May 24, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • May 21, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
March, 2021
  • March 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • March 11, 2021: [Entry]
  • March 11, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 11, 2021: [Probable Cause/Detention Hearing]
  • March 11, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 10, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
  • March 09, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • March 09, 2021: [Waiver of Detention]
  • March 08, 2021: [Empty Text]
  • March 04, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 04, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 04, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
  • March 01, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • March 01, 2021: [Complaint & Affidavit]
  • March 01, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.