U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-po-00001-1
  • Case Name: USA vs DORRIS
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Attorney Appearance]
  • November 12, 2021: [Withdraw Attorney Appearance]
  • November 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • November 10, 2021: [Dismiss]
July, 2021
  • July 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 14, 2021: [Continue]
June, 2021
  • June 02, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
  • June 02, 2021: [CJA - Attorney Appointment Order]
March, 2021
  • March 26, 2021: [Order to Continue]
  • March 26, 2021: [Terminate Hearings]
  • March 03, 2021: [Set Hearings]
  • March 03, 2021: [Citation Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.