U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-mj-00019-1
  • Case Name: USA v. ADAMS
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • March 25, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
  • March 19, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • March 19, 2021: [Probable Cause/Detention Hearing]
  • March 17, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
  • March 15, 2021: [Order]
  • March 15, 2021: [CJA - Attorney Appointment Order]
  • March 15, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 15, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 11, 2021: [SCHEDULING Order]
  • March 10, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for USA]
  • March 10, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • March 10, 2021: [Complaint & Affidavit]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.