U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00218-1
  • Case Name: USA v. FINCH
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 23, 2021: [CJA - Attorney Appointment Order]
  • March 22, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 22, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 19, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
  • March 19, 2021: [Empty Text]
  • March 14, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 14, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 11, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • March 11, 2021: [Complaint & Affidavit]
  • March 11, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.