U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-mj-00022-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CADET
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 24, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • March 24, 2021: [Extension of Time (Other)]
  • March 19, 2021: [Order]
  • March 18, 2021: [CJA - Attorney Appointment Order]
  • March 18, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • March 18, 2021: [Waiver of Detention]
  • March 18, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 18, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
  • March 16, 2021: [SCHEDULING Order]
  • March 15, 2021: [Complaint & Affidavit]
  • March 15, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for USA]
  • March 15, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.