U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00247-1
  • Case Name: USA v. KARLA
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 10, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Commitment to Another District]
  • March 29, 2021: [Entry]
  • March 29, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 29, 2021: [Empty Text]
  • March 23, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for USA]
  • March 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 19, 2021: [Continue]
  • March 19, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
  • March 19, 2021: [Waiver of Rule 5(c)(3) Hearing]
  • March 19, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Rule 5(c)(3)]
  • March 19, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 19, 2021: [0 - Docket Text Only]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.