U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-mj-00037-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hawkins
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • June 10, 2021: [Extension of Time to Indict]
May, 2021
  • May 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • May 12, 2021: [Extension of Time to Indict]
  • May 04, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
April, 2021
  • April 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • April 13, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • April 12, 2021: [Protective Order ]
  • April 12, 2021: [Extension of Time to Indict]
  • April 05, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • April 05, 2021: [Consent to Appear by VTC]
  • April 01, 2021: [Pretrial Bond Report]
March, 2021
  • March 26, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 26, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 26, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 25, 2021: [Pretrial Bond Report]
  • March 24, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 24, 2021: [Consent to Appear by VTC]
  • March 24, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • March 24, 2021: [Order]
  • March 24, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 24, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • March 24, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.